Bishops |
Bishop Gregorio Diamare, O.S.B. Cas. Born: | 1865.04.13 (Italy) | Ordained Priest: | 1891.06.28 | Consecrated Bishop: | 1928.03.12 | Died: | 1945.09.06 († 80) |
| Abbot Ordinary of Montecassino (Italy) (1909.07.20 – 1945.09.06) Provost of Atina (Italy) (1909.07.20 – 1945.09.06) Titular Bishop of Constantia in Arabia (1928.01.27 – 1945.09.06) |
|
Bishop Luiz Carlos Dias (56) Titular Bishop of Tunes Auxiliary Bishop of São Paulo (Brazil)
Born: | 1964.09.16 (Caconde, Brazil) | Ordained Priest: | 1991.04.05 | Consecrated Bishop: | 2016.05.07 |
| Titular Bishop of Tunes (2016.03.16 – ...) Auxiliary Bishop of São Paulo (Brazil) (2016.03.16 – ...) |
|
Bishop Paulo Celso Dias do Nascimento (57) Titular Bishop of Aguntum Auxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro (Brazil)
|
Bishop Antônio Augusto Dias Duarte (71) Titular Bishop of Tuscamia Auxiliary Bishop of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro (Brazil)
Omnia in bonum |
Bishop Sancho Díaz de Trujillo Born: | (Spain) | Consecrated Bishop: | 1539.09.21 |
| Titular Bishop of Marocco (1539.09.09 – ?) Auxiliary Bishop of Plasencia (Spain) (1539.09.09 – 1546) |
|
Bishop Louis Dicaire Avance au large Born: | 1946.08.29 (Montréal, QC, Canada) | Ordained Priest: | 1974.01.20 | Consecrated Bishop: | 1999.03.25 | Died: | 2020.07.19 († 73) |
| Auxiliary Bishop of Montréal (Canada) (1999.02.18 – 2004.06.19) Titular Bishop of Thizica (1999.02.18 – 2020.07.19) Auxiliary Bishop of Saint-Jean–Longueuil (Canada) (2004.06.19 – 2020.07.19) |
|
Bishop Arnaldo di Cambera, O.P. Titular Bishop of Akka (1491.05.09 – ?) |
Bishop Alfonso di Castiglia, O.F.M. |
Bishop Biagio di Chiusano, O.F.M. |
Bishop Klaus Dick (92) Titular Bishop of Guzabeta Auxiliary Bishop emeritus of Köln (Germany)
Obsecramus pro Christo Born: | 1928.02.27 (Germany) | Ordained Priest: | 1953.02.24 | Consecrated Bishop: | 1975.05.19 |
| Auxiliary Bishop of Köln (Germany) (1975.03.17 – 2003.02.24) Titular Bishop of Guzabeta (1975.03.17 – ...) |
|
Bishop Ernst Franz Gerd Werner Dicke (92) Titular Bishop of Iria Flavia Auxiliary Bishop emeritus of Aachen (Germany)
Domino servientes spe gaudentes Born: | 1928.03.28 (Germany) | Ordained Priest: | 1952.07.25 | Consecrated Bishop: | 1970.04.11 |
| Auxiliary Bishop of Aachen (Germany) (1970.02.16 – 2003.11.21) Titular Bishop of Iria Flavia (1970.02.16 – ...) |
|
Bishop Enzo Dieci (86) Titular Bishop of Maura Auxiliary Bishop of the Vicariate of Rome emeritus of Roma (Italy)
Born: | 1934.01.28 (Italy) | Ordained Priest: | 1962.03.17 | Consecrated Bishop: | 1992.04.26 |
| Auxiliary Bishop of the Vicariate of Rome of Roma (Italy) (1992.04.07 – 2009.06.01) Titular Bishop of Maura (1992.04.07 – ...) |
|
Bishop Martin Dieminger |
Bishop Franz Josef Dietl (86) Titular Bishop of Sebarga Auxiliary Bishop emeritus of München und Freising (Germany)
Ex toto corde |
Archbishop Johann Baptist Dietz Agno immaculato Born: | 1879.01.30 (Germany) | Ordained Priest: | 1905.10.28 | Consecrated Bishop: | 1936.09.27 | Died: | 1959.12.10 († 80) |
| Titular Bishop of Jonopolis (1936.07.25 – 1939.04.10) Coadjutor Bishop of Fulda (Germany) (1936.07.25 – 1939.04.10) Bishop of Fulda (Germany) (1939.04.10 – 1958.10.24) Titular Archbishop of Cotrada (1958.10.24 – 1959.12.10) |
|
Bishop Karlheinz Diez (66) Titular Bishop of Villa regis Auxiliary Bishop of Fulda (Germany)
Unum corpus et unus Spiritus in Christo Born: | 1954.02.20 (Germany) | Ordained Priest: | 1978.10.10 | Consecrated Bishop: | 2004.09.26 |
| Titular Bishop of Villa regis (2004.07.13 – ...) Auxiliary Bishop of Fulda (Germany) (2004.07.13 – ...) |
|
Bishop Tomás Díez Bedoya, O.F.M. Cap. Born: | 1781.02.09 (Spain) | Consecrated Bishop: | 1826.04.09 | Died: | 1851.12.26 († 70) |
| Titular Bishop of Cydonia (1825.12.19 – 1851.12.26) Auxiliary Bishop of Santiago de Compostela (Spain) (1825.12.19 – 1851.12.26) |
|
Bishop Giovanni di Falconio, O.F.M. |
Archbishop Pietro Battista di Garbagnate, O.F.M. Ref. | Vicar Apostolic of Smirne (Turkey) (1718.04.09 – 1720.06.15) Titular Archbishop of Carthage (1720.06.15 – 1730.04.11) |
|
Archbishop Vincenzo di Giovanni Born: | 1832.10.19 (Italy) | Ordained Priest: | 1856.09.20 | Died: | 1903.07.20 († 70) |
| Bishop-Prelate of Santa Lucia del Mela (Italy) (1896.10.21 – 1901.03.04) Titular Archbishop of Theodosiopolis (1897.04.01 – 1901.03.22) Titular Archbishop of Pessinus (1901.03.22 – 1903.07.20) |
|
Archbishop Giuseppe di Girolamo Born: | 1872.10.08 (Italy) | Consecrated Bishop: | 1920.06.27 | Died: | 1944.10.28 († 72) |
| Bishop of Lucera (Italy) (1920.04.21 – 1941.01.01) Titular Archbishop of Marcianopolis (1941.01.01 – 1944.10.28) |
|
Bishop Angelo di Grado, O.F.M. Conv. | Titular Bishop of Akka (1588.10.17 – 1620.03.28) |
|
Archbishop Bertrando di Isola, O.F.M. | Titular Archbishop of Ægina (1420.01.15 – 1424?) |
|
Bishop Enrico di Lippia, O.E.S.A. |
Archbishop Pietro Di Maria Cum Christo laboro Born: | 1865.08.03 (Italy) | Ordained Priest: | 1891.05.23 | Consecrated Bishop: | 1906.12.30 | Died: | 1937.09.03 († 72) |
| Bishop of Catanzaro (Italy) (1906.12.06 – 1918.06.11) Apostolic Delegate to Canada and Newfoundland (1918.06.11 – 1926) Titular Archbishop of Iconium (1918.06.11 – 1937.09.03) Apostolic Nuncio to Switzerland (1926 – 1935) |
|
Saint Bishop Felice di Massa Martana Born: | 241? (Massa Martana, Italy) | Consecrated Bishop: | 295 | Died: | 303? 🩸 (Massa Martana, Italy † 62) |
| |
|
Bishop Pietro di Monimo, O.P. |
Bishop Dominic Dinh Mai Luong (Mai Thanh Lương) You are strangers and aliens no longer Born: | 1940.12.20 (Vietnam) | Ordained Priest: | 1966.05.21 | Consecrated Bishop: | 2003.06.11 | Died: | 2017.12.06 († 76) |
| Auxiliary Bishop of Orange (USA) (2003.04.25 – 2015.12.20) Titular Bishop of Cebarades (2003.04.25 – 2017.12.06) |
|
Archbishop Torquato Dini |
Archbishop Joseph Augustine Di Noia, O.P. (77) Titular Archbishop of Oregon City Adjunct Secretary of Congregation for the Doctrine of the Faith
In obœdientia veritatis |
Bishop Marco Dionisi Titular Bishop of Corone (1526.11.07 – ?) |
Archbishop Eugenio di Pesaro, O.E.S.A. |
Bishop Cesare Di Pietro (56) Titular Bishop of Nicopolis ad Iaternum Auxiliary Bishop of Messina–Lipari–Santa Lucia del Mela (Italy)
Vigilate mecum |
Archbishop Jean di Pranga |
Bishop Alexander Dirre Born: | 1610.11.14 (Czechia) | Ordained Priest: | 1634.06.10 | Consecrated Bishop: | 1668.08.16 | Died: | 1669.11.21 († 59) |
| Titular Bishop of Nicopolis (1668.06.11 – 1669.11.21) Auxiliary Bishop of Olomouc (Czechia) (1668.06.11 – 1669.11.21) |
|
Archbishop Michele Di Ruberto (86) Titular Archbishop of Biccari Secretary emeritus of Congregation for the Causes of Saints
|
Archbishop Guglielmo di San Nicola, O.P. Titular Archbishop of Tyrus (1384.06.06 – 1384) |
Bishop Guerino Di Tora (74) Titular Bishop of Zuri Auxiliary Bishop of the Vicariate of Rome of Roma (Italy)
Super omnia caritas Born: | 1946.08.02 (Italy) | Ordained Priest: | 1971.03.14 | Consecrated Bishop: | 2009.07.11 |
| Titular Bishop of Zuri (2009.06.01 – ...) Auxiliary Bishop of the Vicariate of Rome of Roma (Italy) (2009.06.01 – ...) |
|
Archbishop Agostino Buzio di Varese, O.F.M. |
Bishop Léon Eugène Émile François Dixneuf Born: | 1920.09.22 (France) | Ordained Priest: | 1944.12.23 | Consecrated Bishop: | 1973.01.14 | Died: | 1973.06.27 († 52) |
| Titular Bishop of Vassinassa (1972.11.27 – 1973.06.27) Auxiliary Bishop of Rennes (France) (1972.11.27 – 1973.06.27) |
|
Bishop Johann Ignaz Dlouhovesky Born: | 1638.02.06 (Czechia) | Ordained Priest: | 1661.12.21 | Consecrated Bishop: | 1679.06.11 | Died: | 1701.01.10 († 62) |
| Titular Bishop of Milevum (1679.04.10 – 1701.01.10) Auxiliary Bishop of Praha (Czechia) (1679.04.10 – 1701.01.10) |
|
Bishop Antoni Józef Długosz (79) Titular Bishop of Aggar Auxiliary Bishop emeritus of Częstochowa (Poland)
Servire Born: | 1941.04.18 (Poland) | Ordained Priest: | 1965.06.20 | Consecrated Bishop: | 1994.01.06 |
| Auxiliary Bishop of Częstochowa (Poland) (1993.12.18 – 2016.05.07) Titular Bishop of Aggar (1993.12.18 – ...) |
|
Bishop Ignatius Dłuski |
Bishop Jan Dłużewski Born: | 1658.01 | Died: | 1720 († 62) |
| Titular Bishop of Gratianopolis (1696.06.18 – 1720) Auxiliary Bishop of Chełm (1696.06.18 – 1720) |
|