Consistory of 2019.10.05 (13) |
1. Cardinal Miguel Ángel Ayuso Guixot, M.C.C.J. (68) Secundum misericordiam tuam Cardinal-Deacon of S. Girolamo della Carità President of Pontifical Council for Inter-Religious Dialogue Prefect of Commission for Religious Relations with Muslims
|
2. Cardinal José Tolentino Calaça de Mendonça (55) Considerate lilia agri Cardinal-Deacon of Ss. Domenico e Sisto Librarian of Vatican Apostolic Library Archivist of Vatican Apostolic Archives
|
3. Cardinal Ignatius Suharyo Hardjoatmodjo (70) Serviens Domino cum omni humilitate Cardinal-Priest of Spirito Santo alla Ferratella Metropolitan Archbishop of Jakarta (Indonesia) Military Ordinary of Indonesia (Indonesia) President of Episcopal Conference of Indonesia
|
4. Cardinal Juan de la Caridad García Rodríguez (72) Ve y anuncia el evangelio Cardinal-Priest of Ss. Aquila e Priscilla Metropolitan Archbishop of La Habana (Cuba)
|
5. Cardinal Fridolin Ambongo Besungu, O.F.M. Cap. (61) Les grâces du Seigneur sont avec nous Cardinal-Priest of S. Gabriele Arcangelo all’Acqua Traversa Metropolitan Archbishop of Kinshasa (Congo-Kinshasa) Apostolic Administrator of Kisantu (Congo-Kinshasa) Member of Council of Cardinals to assist in the governance of the Universal Church and to reform the Roman Curia Vice-President of National Episcopal Conference of Congo
|
6. Cardinal Jean-Claude Hollerich, S.J. (62) Annuntiate Cardinal-Priest of S. Giovanni Crisostomo a Monte Sacro Alto Archbishop of Luxembourg (Luxembourg) President of Commission of the Bishops’ Conferences of the European Community
|
7. Cardinal Álvaro Leonel Ramazzini Imeri (73) Ay de mí si no evangelizo Cardinal-Priest of S. Giovanni Evangelista a Spinaceto Bishop of Huehuetenango (Guatemala)
|
8. Cardinal Matteo Maria Zuppi (65) Gaudium Domini fortitudo vestra Cardinal-Priest of S. Egidio Metropolitan Archbishop of Bologna (Italy)
Born: | 1955.10.11 (Roma, Italy) | Ordained Priest: | 1981.05.09 | Consecrated Bishop: | 2012.04.14 | Created Cardinal: | 2019.10.05 |
| Titular Bishop of Villa nova (2012.01.31 – 2015.10.27) Auxiliary Bishop of the Vicariate of Rome of Roma (Italy) (2012.01.31 – 2015.10.27) Metropolitan Archbishop of Bologna (Italy) (2015.10.27 – ...) Cardinal-Priest of S. Egidio (2019.10.05 [2020.01.11] – ...) |
|
9. Cardinal Cristóbal López Romero, S.D.B. (69) Adveniat regnum tuum Cardinal-Priest of S. Leone I Archbishop of Rabat (Morocco) Apostolic Administrator of Tánger (Morocco)
Born: | 1952.05.19 (Vélez-Rubio, Spain) | Ordained Priest: | 1979.05.19 | Consecrated Bishop: | 2018.03.10 | Created Cardinal: | 2019.10.05 |
| Archbishop of Rabat (Morocco) (2017.12.29 – ...) Apostolic Administrator of Tánger (Morocco) (2019.05.24 – ...) Cardinal-Priest of S. Leone I (2019.10.05 [2020.02.16] – ...) |
|
10. Cardinal Michael Czerny, S.J. (74) Suscipe Cardinal-Deacon of S. Michele Arcangelo Undersecretary of Migrant and Refugee Section of Dicastery for Promoting Integral Human Development
|
11. Cardinal Michael Louis Fitzgerald, M. Afr. (83) Fructum dabit Cardinal-Deacon of S. Maria in Portico President emeritus of Pontifical Council for Inter-Religious Dialogue Prefect emeritus of Commission for Religious Relations with Muslims
|
12. Cardinal Sigitas Tamkevičius, S.J. (82) Dominus illuminatio mea Cardinal-Priest of S. Angela Merici Metropolitan Archbishop emeritus of Kaunas (Lithuania)
|
13. Cardinal Eugenio Dal Corso, P.S.D.P. (82) Sapientia Cardinal-Priest of S. Anastasia Bishop emeritus of Benguela (Angola)
Born: | 1939.05.16 (Lugo di Valpantena di Grezzana, Italy) | Ordained Priest: | 1963.07.07 | Consecrated Bishop: | 1996.03.03 | Created Cardinal: | 2019.10.05 |
| Coadjutor Bishop of Saurimo (Angola) (1995.12.15 – 1997.01.15) Bishop of Saurimo (Angola) (1997.01.15 – 2008.02.18) Bishop of Benguela (Angola) (2008.02.18 – 2018.03.26) Cardinal-Priest of S. Anastasia (2019.10.05 [2019.11.17] – ...) |
|