Date | Recent Events |
2021.10.25 | Dr. Charlotte Kreuter-Kirchhof, Member of Council for the Economy, was appointed as Vice-Coordinator of Council for the Economy |
2021.10.17 | Fr. Andrés Gabriel Ferrada Moreira was consecrated as Titular Archbishop of Tiburnia and Secretary of Congregation for Clergy |
2021.10.11 | Msgr. Cristiano Antonietti was appointed as Papal Master of Ceremonies of Office for the Liturgical Celebrations of the Supreme Pontiff Msgr. Diego Giovanni Ravelli, Papal Master of Ceremonies of Office for the Liturgical Celebrations of the Supreme Pontiff, was appointed as Master of Papal Liturgical Celebrations of Office for the Liturgical Celebrations of the Supreme Pontiff and Head of Pontifical Musical Chorus of the Sistine Chapel |
2021.10.05 | Sr. Yvonne Reungoat, F.M.A., resigned as Superior General of Salesian Sisters of Don Bosco and Vice-Grand Chancellor of Pontifical Faculty of Education Sciences (Auxilium) Sr. Chiara Cazzuola, F.M.A., was appointed as Superior General of Salesian Sisters of Don Bosco and Vice-Grand Chancellor of Pontifical Faculty of Education Sciences (Auxilium) |
2021.10.01 | Archbishop-elect Andrés Gabriel Ferrada Moreira was appointed as Secretary of Congregation for Clergy Archbishop Joël Mercier resigned as Secretary of Congregation for Clergy Cardinal Giuseppe Bertello resigned as President of Pontifical Commission for Vatican City State and President of Governorate of Vatican City State Archbishop Fernando Vérgez Alzaga, L.C., Director of Directorate of Telecommunications and Information Systems of Vatican City State, Secretary General of Governorate of Vatican City State, Member of Financial Security Committee and Member of Commission for Confidential Matters, was appointed as President of Pontifical Commission for Vatican City State and President of Governorate of Vatican City State |
2021.09.29 | Fr. Serge-Thomas Bonino, O.P., resigned as Secretary General of International Theological Commission Msgr. Piero Coda was appointed as Secretary General of International Theological Commission |
2021.09.26 | Cardinal Mario Grech took possession as Cardinal-Deacon of Ss. Cosma e Damiano |
2021.09.14 | Dr. Marco Buonocore resigned as President of Roman Pontifical Academy of Archaeology Dr. Maurizio Sannibale was appointed as President of Roman Pontifical Academy of Archaeology |
2021.09.13 | Archbishop Piero Marini resigned as President of Pontifical Committee for International Eucharistic Congresses Fr. Corrado Maggioni, S.M.M., Undersecretary of Congregation for Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments, was appointed as President of Pontifical Committee for International Eucharistic Congresses |
2021.09.08 | Bishop Fernando Vérgez Alzaga, L.C., Director of Directorate of Telecommunications and Information Systems of Vatican City State, Secretary General of Governorate of Vatican City State, Titular Bishop of Villamagna in Proconsulari, Member of Financial Security Committee and Member of Commission for Confidential Matters, was promoted as Titular Archbishop of Villamagna in Proconsulari |
2021.09.01 | Msgr. Philippe Bordeyne was appointed as President of Pontifical John Paul II Theological Institute for Matrimonial and Family Science Msgr. Pierangelo Sequeri resigned as President of Pontifical John Paul II Theological Institute for Matrimonial and Family Science Fr. Kolumban Reichlin, O.S.B., was appointed as Chaplain of Pontifical Swiss Guard Fr. Thomas Widmer resigned as Chaplain of Pontifical Swiss Guard |
2021.09 | Bishop Gustavo Óscar Zanchetta resigned as Assessor of Administration of the Patrimony of the Apostolic See |
2021.08.29 | Archbishop Vittorio Francesco Viola, O.F.M., resigned as Apostolic Administrator of Tortona (Italy) Msgr. Guido Marini, Master of Papal Liturgical Celebrations of Office for the Liturgical Celebrations of the Supreme Pontiff and Head of Pontifical Musical Chorus of the Sistine Chapel, was elected Bishop of Tortona (Italy) |
2021.08.26 | Fr. Augusto Zampini-Davies resigned as Adjunct Secretary of Dicastery for Promoting Integral Human Development Fr. Fabio Baggio, C.S., Undersecretary of Migrant and Refugee Section of Dicastery for Promoting Integral Human Development, was appointed as Secretary of Vatican COVID-19 Commission Sr. Alessandra Smerilli, F.M.A., Undersecretary of Faith and Development Section of Dicastery for Promoting Integral Human Development, was appointed as Secretary of Dicastery for Promoting Integral Human Development and Delegate to Vatican COVID-19 Commission |
2021.07.26 | Prof. Rodrigo Guerra López was appointed as Secretary of Pontifical Commission for Latin America |
2021.07.13 | Fr. Massimo Fusarelli, O.F.M., was appointed as Minister General of Order of Friars Minor (Franciscans) and Grand Chancellor of Pontifical University Antonianum Fr. Michael Anthony Perry, O.F.M., resigned as Minister General of Order of Friars Minor (Franciscans) and Grand Chancellor of Pontifical University Antonianum |
2021.07.11 | Fr. Aurelio García Macías was consecrated as Titular Bishop of Rotdon and Undersecretary of Congregation for Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments |
2021.07.04 | Bishop Luis Manuel Alí Herrera, Member of Pontifical Commission for the Protection of Minors and Auxiliary Bishop of Bogotá (Colombia), was appointed as General Secretary of Episcopal Conference of Colombia |
2021.07 | Fr. Bruno-Marie Duffé resigned as Secretary of Dicastery for Promoting Integral Human Development and Secretary of Vatican COVID-19 Commission |
2021.06.30 | Fr. Andrea Bozzolo, S.D.B., was appointed as Rector Magnificus of Salesian Pontifical University |
2021.06.29 | Msgr. Orazio Pepe was appointed as Secretary of Fabric of St. Peter |
2021.06.24 | Archbishop Cyril Vasil’, S.J., Titular Archbishop of Ptolemais in Libya, Member of College for the review of appeals by clergy accused of delicta reservata and Apostolic Administrator sede plena of Košice of the Slovaks (Slovakia), was appointed as Archbishop-Bishop of Košice of the Slovaks (Slovakia) |
2021.06.22 | Fr. Andrew Small, O.M.I., was appointed as Secretary pro tempore of Pontifical Commission for the Protection of Minors Fr. Sebastiano Paciolla, O. Cist., Promoter of Justice of Supreme Tribunal of the Apostolic Signatura, passed away at 58 |
2021.06.16 | Fr. Luigi Maria Epicoco was appointed as Ecclesiastical Assistant of Dicastery for Communication and Editorialist of L’Osservatore Romano |
2021.06.13 | Cardinal Raniero Cantalamessa, O.F.M. Cap., took possession as Cardinal-Deacon of S. Apollinare alle Terme Neroniane-Alessandrine |
2021.06.11 | Cardinal Marcello Semeraro resigned as Apostolic Administrator of Albano (Italy) Cardinal Beniamino Stella resigned as Prefect of Congregation for Clergy and President of Interdicasterial Commission for Candidates to Sacred Order Bishop Lazzaro You Heung-sik (유흥식 라자로 / 俞興植), Bishop of Daejeon 대전 (South Korea) and Vice-President of Catholic Bishops’ Conference of Korea, was promoted as Prefect of Congregation for Clergy, President of Interdicasterial Commission for Candidates to Sacred Order and Archbishop ad personam |
2021.06.10 | Fr. Michał Paluch, O.P., resigned as Rector Magnificus of Pontifical University of St. Thomas Aquinas (Angelicum) Fr. Thomas Joseph White, O.P., was appointed as Rector Magnificus of Pontifical University of St. Thomas Aquinas (Angelicum) |
2021.05.29 | Cardinal Mauro Gambetti, O.F.M. Conv., took possession as Cardinal-Deacon of SS. Nome di Maria al Foro Traiano |
2021.05.27 | Archbishop Arthur Roche, Secretary of Congregation for Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments, Archbishop ad personam and Member of College for the review of appeals by clergy accused of delicta reservata, was appointed as Prefect of Congregation for Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments Bishop Vittorio Francesco Viola, O.F.M., Bishop of Tortona (Italy), was promoted as Apostolic Administrator of Tortona (Italy), Secretary of Congregation for Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments and Archbishop ad personam Fr. Aurelio García Macías was elected Titular Bishop of Rotdon and Undersecretary of Congregation for Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments |
2021.05.19 | Prof. Lucia Bozzi was appointed as Applied Magistrate of Tribunal of Vatican City State |
2021.05.08 | Msgr. Alejandro Arellano Cedillo, C.O.R.C., Dean of Tribunal of the Roman Rota, was appointed as President of Appeals Court of Vatican City State |
2021.05.05 | Dr. Alessandro Cassinis Righini, Auditor General ad interim of Office of the Auditor General, was appointed as Auditor General of Office of the Auditor General |
2021.05.03 | Cardinal Mauro Piacenza, Cardinal-Deacon of S. Paolo alle Tre Fontane and Major Penitentiary of Apostolic Penitentiary, was appointed as Cardinal-Priest of S. Paolo alle Tre Fontane pro hac vice Title Cardinal Gianfranco Ravasi, President of Pontifical Council for Culture, President of Pontifical Commission for Sacred Archaeology and Cardinal-Deacon of S. Giorgio in Velabro, was appointed as Cardinal-Priest of S. Giorgio in Velabro pro hac vice Title Cardinal Kurt Koch, President of Pontifical Council for Promoting Christian Unity, President of Commission for Religious Relations with the Jews and Cardinal-Deacon of Nostra Signora del Sacro Cuore, was appointed as Cardinal-Priest of Nostra Signora del Sacro Cuore pro hac vice Title |
2021.04.12 | Fr. Armando Matteo was appointed as Adjunct Undersecretary of Congregation for the Doctrine of the Faith |
2021.04.11 | Fr. Luis Marín de San Martín, O.S.A., was consecrated as Titular Bishop of Suliana and Undersecretary of Synod of Bishops |
2021.03.30 | Msgr. Alejandro Arellano Cedillo, C.O.R.C., Prelate Auditor of Tribunal of the Roman Rota, was appointed as Dean of Tribunal of the Roman Rota |
2021.03.29 | Archbishop Mario Giordana resigned as Extraordinary Commissioner for Fabric of St. Peter Msgr. Pio Vito Pinto resigned as Dean of Tribunal of the Roman Rota and President of Appeals Court of Vatican City State |
2021.03.24 | Mr. Juan Carlos Cruz was appointed as Member of Pontifical Commission for the Protection of Minors Sr. Alessandra Smerilli, F.M.A., was appointed as Undersecretary of Faith and Development Section of Dicastery for Promoting Integral Human Development Msgr. Robert W. Oliver resigned as Secretary of Pontifical Commission for the Protection of Minors |
2021.03.22 | Bishop Vittorio Lanzani resigned as Delegate of Fabric of St. Peter |
2021.03.20 | Archbishop Giuseppe Satriano resigned as Apostolic Administrator of Rossano–Cariati (Italy) |
2021.03.09 | Sr. Nuria Calduch-Benages, M.H.S.F.N., was appointed as Secretary of Pontifical Biblical Commission |
2021.02.24 | Prof. Roberto Bernabei was appointed as Personal Doctor of the Pope of Prefecture of the Papal Household |
2021.02.22 | Dr. Immacolata Incocciati was appointed as Secretary General of Pontifical Lateran University |
2021.02.20 | Cardinal Robert Sarah resigned as Prefect of Congregation for Divine Worship and the Discipline of the Sacraments Cardinal Angelo Comastri resigned as Vicar General for the Vatican City State of Roma (Italy), President of Fabric of St. Peter and Archpriest of Papal Basilica of St. Peter Cardinal Mauro Gambetti, O.F.M. Conv., was appointed as Vicar General for the Vatican City State of Roma (Italy), President of Fabric of St. Peter and Archpriest of Papal Basilica of St. Peter |
2021.02.06 | Sr. Nathalie Becquart, X.M.C.J., was appointed as Undersecretary of Synod of Bishops Fr. Luis Marín de San Martín, O.S.A., was elected Titular Bishop of Suliana and Undersecretary of Synod of Bishops |
2021.02.05 | Dr. Catia Summaria was appointed as Promotor of Justice of Appeals Court of Vatican City State |
2021.01.24 | Fr. Raffaele Di Muro, O.F.M. Conv., was appointed as President of Pontifical Theological Faculty of St. Bonaventure (Seraphicum) Fr. Domenico Paoletti, O.F.M. Conv., resigned as President of Pontifical Theological Faculty of St. Bonaventure (Seraphicum) |
2021.01.18 | Bishop Fabio Fabene, Undersecretary of Synod of Bishops and Titular Bishop of Montefiascone, was promoted as Titular Archbishop of Montefiascone and Secretary of Congregation for the Causes of Saints |
2021.01.09 | Dr. Fabrizio Soccorsi, Personal Doctor of the Pope of Prefecture of the Papal Household, passed away at 78 |
2021.01.08 | Prof. Vincenzo Buonomo, Rector Magnificus of Pontifical Lateran University, was appointed as President of Disciplinary Commission of the Roman Curia |
2021 | Fr. Mauro Mantovani, S.D.B., resigned as Rector Magnificus of Salesian Pontifical University |
2020.12.29 | Archbishop Marcello Bartolucci resigned as Secretary of Congregation for the Causes of Saints |
2020.12.19 | Archbishop Tommaso Caputo resigned as Apostolic Administrator of Caserta (Italy) |
2020.12.17 | Msgr. Mauricio Rueda Beltz was appointed as Undersecretary for the Section for Personnel of Diplomatic Role of Secretariat of State Archbishop Jan Romeo Pawłowski, Delegate for Pontifical Representations of Secretariat of State, was appointed as Secretary for Pontifical Representations of Secretariat of State |
2020.11.28 | Fr. Raniero Cantalamessa, O.F.M. Cap., Preacher of Prefecture of the Papal Household, was created Cardinal-Deacon of S. Apollinare alle Terme Neroniane-Alessandrine Archbishop Marcello Semeraro, Apostolic Administrator of Santa Maria di Grottaferrata of the Italo-Albanese (Italy), Pontifical Delegate for Italian Basilian Order of Grottaferrata, Archbishop ad personam, Apostolic Administrator of Albano (Italy) and Prefect of Congregation for the Causes of Saints, was created Cardinal-Deacon of S. Maria in Domnica Bishop Mario Grech, Secretary General of Synod of Bishops, was created Cardinal-Deacon of Ss. Cosma e Damiano |
2020.11.23 | Cardinal Fridolin Ambongo Besungu, O.F.M. Cap., Vice-President of National Episcopal Conference of Congo, Metropolitan Archbishop of Kinshasa (Congo-Kinshasa) and Member of Council of Cardinals to assist in the governance of the Universal Church and to reform the Roman Curia, was appointed as Apostolic Administrator of Kisantu (Congo-Kinshasa) |
2020.11.22 | Msgr. Marcos Pavan, Director Master ad interim of Pontifical Musical Chorus of the Sistine Chapel, was appointed as Director Master of Pontifical Musical Chorus of the Sistine Chapel |
2020.11.19 | Fr. Joseph Varghese Maliakkal, O.C.D., resigned as President of Pontifical Theological Faculty and Pontifical Institute of Spirituality (Teresianum) Fr. Christof Betschart, O.C.D., was appointed as President of Pontifical Theological Faculty and Pontifical Institute of Spirituality (Teresianum) |
2020.11.15 | Cardinal Giovanni Battista Re took possession as Cardinal-Bishop of Ostia |
2020.10.29 | Archbishop Francesco Cacucci resigned as Metropolitan Archbishop of Bari–Bitonto (Italy) and Pontifical Delegate for the Basilica of St. Nicholas of Bari Archbishop Giuseppe Satriano, Archbishop of Rossano–Cariati (Italy), was appointed as Apostolic Administrator of Rossano–Cariati (Italy), Metropolitan Archbishop of Bari–Bitonto (Italy) and Pontifical Delegate for the Basilica of St. Nicholas of Bari |
... |