About the project
This project attempts to create a biographical database, which covers the army generals of all participating countries of the Second World War. At the moment the database contains 28264 short biographical sketches of the army generals of World War 2.
However, taking into account the scope of the project, the information on each general will vary in detail. Some generals have only been identified and listed with their last names, while others are listed with full names and sketches of their military careers. I am engaged in the quest for further biographical information on the generals and as a result there will be continual updates.
To find information on a specific general use the Search function or just click on The Generals and then choose the country of origin.
I hope that you will find this a useful reference tool.
Service
1916-12-XX |
– | 1917-10-01 |
District Material Officer, Panama Coast Artillery District |
1917-10-01 |
– | 1917-10-31 |
Attached to the Office of the Adjutant-General |
1917-11-08 |
– | 1918-08-26 |
Commanding Officer 351st Field Artillery Regiment [France] |
1918-10-04 |
– | 1918-12-12 |
Commanding Officer 11th Field Artillery Brigade |
1918-12-16 |
– | 1919-01-07 |
Commanding Officer 20th Field Artillery Brigade |
1919-01-07 |
– | 1919-04-10 |
Commanding Officer Camp Jackson, South Carolina |
1919-04-18 |
– | 1919-07-25 |
Attached to Adjutant-General's Department |
1920-08-05 |
– | 1921-06-30 |
Commanding Officer 30th Coast Artillery Brigade |
1920-08-16 |
– | 1921-05-31 |
Commanding Officer 52nd Coast Artillery Regiment |
1920-09-09 |
– | 1920-11-03 |
Commanding Officer Coast Artillery Training Center, Fort Monroe, Virginia |
1921-05-18 |
– | 1921-07-01 |
Commanding Officer 43rd Coast Artillery Regiment |
1921-07-01 |
– | 1924-12-25 |
Assistant to the Chief of Coast Artillery |
1924-12-26 |
– | 1925-05-XX |
Chief of Staff, Hawaiian Coast Artillery Brigade |
1925-05-15 |
– | 1927-08-31 |
Commanding Officer Coast Defenses of Pearl Harbor |
1925-05-15 |
– | 1927-08-31 |
Commanding Officer 55th Coast Artillery Brigade |
1927-11-30 |
– | 1930-01-13 |
President of the Coast Artillery Board |
1929-01-15 |
– | 1930-03-31 |
Commanding Officer 30th Coast Artillery Brigade |
1930-02-17 |
– | 1930-03-15 |
Attending General Officers' Refresher Course, Fort Benning, Georgia |
1930-05-08 |
– | 1930-09-12 |
Commanding Officer 1st Coast Artillery District |
1930-10-25 |
– | 1931-01-06 |
Commanding Officer 22nd Infantry Brigade |
1931-04-07 |
– | 1932-10-03 |
Commanding Officer Hawaiian Separate Coast Artillery Brigade |
1932-11-04 |
– | 1936-01-25 |
Commanding Officer 2nd Coast Artillery District |
1933-06-02 |
– | 1936-01-25 |
Commanding Southern Zone Civil Conservation Corps |
1936-01-25 |
– | 1938-07-31 |
Commanding General 5th Corps Area |
1938-09-30 |
| |
Retired |
1941-12-08 |
| |
Recalled |
1941-12-08 |
– | 1944-09-05 |
Member of the War Department Personnel Board |
1944-09-05 |
| |
Retired |
Picture source: http://www.arlingtoncemetery.net/wecole-photo-library-of-congress-001.jpg
Contact
Any comments, suggestions or corrections please feel free to contact me at:
webmaster@generals.dk
Best Regards
Steen Ammentorp, Librarian DB., M.L.I.Sc.